Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Kipke, Angel, Hettleman, Korman, Lierman, Moon, West, McMillan, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to provide prescription monitoring data to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration for further investigation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166883/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {166883/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {587278/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   21-2A-02, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page