Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Acevero, Boyce, Bridges, Crutchfield, Dumais, Hettleman, Kelly, Kerr, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Mosby, Stewart, Washington, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under certain circumstances or possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under certain circumstances; establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties to review penalites for violations in the Maryland Code and make recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme throughout the Code; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0277 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {443225/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-12)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Text - First - Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Reassigned to Economic Matters 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (122-17) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {443225/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (124-12) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 578
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law and Civil Offenses – Classifications
(   6-321, 6-322 )
(   10-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page