Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the personal property tax persons with personal property that had a total original cost of less than $2,500; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Text - Chapter - Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page