Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Obstruction - Monitoring Systems Expansion and Workgroup (Better Bus Service Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from parking or standing certain vehicles in a dedicated bus lane; making statewide the authority of a local jurisdiction to use, in accordance with certain standards and procedures, a bus lane monitoring system to enforce the prohibition against driving, standing, or parking a motor vehicle in a designated bus lane; establishing the Workgroup on Curb Space Management; and requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations by July 1, 2024, on how to effectively manage curb space changes on certain roadways.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1027 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, October 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2023
Legislative Date
9/28/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/28/2023 9/28/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Obstruction - Monitoring Systems Expansion and Workgroup (Better Bus Service Act of 2024)
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/2/2024 11:39 AM
Click to return on the top page