Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of certain cooperative housing corporations, condominiums, or homeowners associations to have a reserve study conducted of the common elements of the cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association and to update the study every 5 years; imposing certain requirements relating to the annual budget of a cooperative housing corporation, condominium, or homeowners association; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0313 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/29/2021
Legislative Date
9/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/29/2021 9/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/17/2022 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page