Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to study and make recommendations on the feasibility of establishing a point-to-point commuter bus route that serves population centers along the I-270 corridor in Frederick and Montgomery Counties and provides service to and from job centers in Northern Virginia; requiring the Department to consult with certain governments, stakeholders, and entities and to study and make recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0242
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0390 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/20/2020
Legislative Date
7/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/20/2020 7/20/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page