Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Anderson, Angel, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jones, Krebs, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McDonough, Miele, W. Miller, Morhaim, O'Donnell, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Stein, M. Washington, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the impact of State and local taxes on small businesses; requiring a report on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page