Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Branch, Brooks, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, C. Howard, Kramer, J. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, Moon, Mosby, Proctor, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Vallario, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the requirement that criminal sentencing guidelines adopted by the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy set forth a range of increased severity for defendants who have been previously adjudicated delinquent to adjudication and commitment to a hardware secure juvenile detention facility; and defining "hardware secure" as a facility that relies primarily on the use of construction and hardware, including locks, bars, and fences, to restrict freedom.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0938
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {693921/2 (Delegate Folden) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Floor Amendment {693921/2 (Delegate Folden) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page