Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, R. Lewis, Stein, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the health care services the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, is required to provide through telehealth; altering the circumstances under which the Program is required to provide health care services through telehealth; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a certain amendment to certain waivers to implement certain requirements of this Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0003
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Last Updated: 1/24/2021 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page