Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Notice of Utility Bills in Residential Leases - Gas and Electric Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Allen, Foley, Holmes, Lehman, J. Long, Love, Ruth, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding gas and electric utility services to the types of utility services for which certain landlords are required to provide a certain notice in a written lease and a copy of a certain receipt or bill summary under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0171
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/03/2023
Legislative Date
10/03/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/03/2023 10/03/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Office of Home Energy Programs - Financial Assistance
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {273129/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Notice of Utility Bills in Residential Leases - Gas and Electric Services
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2024 2/15/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {153620/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-34) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Landlord and Tenant - Notice of Utility Bills in Residential Leases - Gas and Electric Services
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:12 AM
Click to return on the top page