Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals
Sponsored by
Delegates Hartman, Buckel, Cox, Krebs, McKay, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Saab, Szeliga, and Thiam
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make arrangements with crematories, morticians, and funeral directors in the State to receive reports of names and addresses of individuals who were Maryland residents at least 16 years of age at the time they died and who died within the preceding 30 days; requiring, at least once every 30 days, the State Administrator to transmit the names and addresses of the deceased individuals to the appropriate local boards of elections; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2022
Legislative Date
1/06/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elections – Voter Registry – Notification and Removal of Deceased Individuals
House 1/06/2022 1/06/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page