Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Anderson, Barkley, Bromwell, Cluster, Conaway, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gibson, Hettleman, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Pendergrass, Proctor, Rey, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions allowing individuals under the age of 17 to marry under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0670
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0799 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {522215/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-36)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Kittleman and Gibson)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Kittleman and Gibson)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {522215/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {703921/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-84) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-36) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {638474/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Kittleman and Gibson) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Kittleman and Gibson) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-301, 2-402, 2-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page