Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Barve, Brooks, Dumais, Fennell, Gilchrist, Guyton, R. Lewis, Queen, and P. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured who becomes a surviving spouse based solely on the insured's change in marital status.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0607
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1748 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303999/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {303999/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Status as Surviving Spouse
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Finance 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page