Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman and J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing, for certain fiscal years, the requirement that the Secretary of Transportation withhold 35% of the State's share of annual operating grants for the Washington Suburban Transit District if the State's operating assistance provided in the approved Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority budget increases by more than 3% over the total operating assistance provided in the prior fiscal year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0126
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/26/2023
Legislative Date
9/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-30)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/26/2023 9/26/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {263527/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (108-30) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2024 8:25 PM
Click to return on the top page