Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Aging)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing more than one grant for a senior citizen activity center from the Senior Citizen Activities Centers Capital Improvement Grants Program if the sum of grants made for any single center does not exceed $800,000 in any 15-year period.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Rules 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text - Chapter - Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
(   10-501, 10-502, 10-504, 10-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page