Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland State Song - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Reznik, Ebersole, Angel, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Kelly, Lam, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Tarlau, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising the state song based on select verses from the poems "Maryland! My Maryland!", written by James Ryder Randall in 1861 and "Maryland, My Maryland", written by John T. White in 1894.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0049
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
1/22/2016 Text - First - Maryland State Song - Revision
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page