Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Adams, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the State corporate income tax rate from 8.25% to 6% beginning in tax year 2015.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0170 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page