Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderson, Barron, Beidle, Branch, Clippinger, Ebersole, Glenn, Hayes, Hettleman, Korman, Lafferty, R. Lewis, McCray, Oaks, Robinson, M. Washington, and Ali
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a specified percentage of operating costs for specified public transit services must be recovered by the Maryland Transit Administration from specified revenues; altering the content of specified annual performance reports to be submitted by the Administration to specified committees of the General Assembly by December 1 of each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-50)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery, Goals, and Performance Indicators
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714968/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {183829/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Floor Amendment {893421/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (85-50) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page