Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Abortion Data - Submission to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to submit to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention any data regarding abortion requested by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, unless submitting the data would violate federal or State law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Abortion Data - Submission to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing 3/15 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:52 PM
Click to return on the top page