Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified notices and statements relating to homeowner's insurance to be delivered by electronic means if the insurer complies with specified requirements; authorizing insurers to comply with specified renewal notice requirements relating to homeowner's insurance by sending a specified notice; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt by regulation a specified notice to be provided to insureds and policyholders at each renewal that contains specified information; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Finance 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text - Chapter - Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
(   19-202, 19-205, 19-206, 19-206.1, 19-207, 19-209.1, 19-210, 19-214, 19-215, 19-216, 27-501, 27-601.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page