Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that any gas service newly installed at an occupied structure may have a gas service regulator installed only outside the structure; requiring an existing interior gas service regulator in a multifamily residential structure to be relocated outside whenever a gas service line or regulator is replaced; requiring a gas company, on or before January 1, 2022, to file a plan with the Public Service Commission to relocate any gas service regulator that provides service to a multifamily residential structure; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0503
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0408 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2020
Legislative Date
8/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443991/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-33)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2020 8/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {443991/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-33) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Finance 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page