Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, Luedtke, D. Barnes, Barron, Ebersole, Fennell, Hill, Hornberger, Ivey, Kelly, Proctor, Smith, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that certain county boards of education develop and maintain a funding accountability website; requiring that each county board report annually certain financial information to the Department of Budget and Management beginning January 1, 2020; requiring the Department to post certain information provided by each county board on its Funding Accountability & Transparency website; providing the Act may not be construed to require the disclosure of certain confidential information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Ethics Law - School Boards - Disclosures and Requirements (School System Ethics and Transparency Act of 2019)
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Reassigned to Ways and Means 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable with Amendments {705660/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Ethics Law - School Boards - Disclosures and Requirements (School System Ethics and Transparency Act of 2019)
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {864435/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text - Chapter - Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
(   5-115, 5-116 through 5-119 )
(   4-206, 5-816, 5-817, 5-817.1, 5-818, 5-819.1, 5-819.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page