Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Barron, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to withhold a portion of the State's annual operating grant to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Transportation to provide an annual grant of at least $167,000,000 to pay capital costs of the Authority; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to prepare a Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan in consultation with certain entities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Metro Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {979130/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {173721/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/25/2018
Legislative Date
4/25/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Metro Funding Act
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {594361/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {979130/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {173721/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Post Passage 4/25/2018 4/25/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text - Chapter - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
(   10-205, 3-216, 7-205, 7-301.1, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page