Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Buckel, B. Barnes, Korman, Platt, Queen, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under specified circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under specified circumstances; requiring offenders to be issued a citation under specified circumstances; and providing a maximum fine of $100.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters Judiciary
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Reassigned to Economic Matters Judiciary 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   6-321, 6-322 )
(   10-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page