Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Alterations (Maryland Meals for Achievement Flexibility Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that secondary schools participating in the Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program may serve breakfast in any broadly accessible part of the school; and authorizing elementary schools participating in the Program, subject to certain approval and allowances, to serve breakfast in any broadly accessible part of the school, including from "Grab and Go" carts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/11/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Alterations (Maryland Meals for Achievement Flexibility Act of 2024)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Alterations (Maryland Meals for Achievement Flexibility Act of 2024)
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2024 2/11/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page