Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Insurance Association - Insurers - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Brooks, Carey, and Glenn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers that deny, cancel, or nonrenew specified coverage for essential property insurance or homeowner's insurance to provide notice to specified applicants or insureds of the possible availability of insurance coverage through the Joint Insurance Association under a specified provision of law or another plan; providing for the content and manner of providing the notice; and applying the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 26
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 28
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading Finance 28
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   19-117, 25-406, 27-602, 27-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page