Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before December 31, 2021, each county board of education to adopt a policy prohibiting the use or display of a symbol of hate; requiring the policy to prohibit the display of a symbol of hate on clothing, book bags, folders, or similar items and to provide a student who displays a hate symbol the opportunity to remove or cover up the symbol; providing an exception to allow a symbol of hate to be used as an example in a course of study; requiring a county board to distribute educational materials about the policy; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/27/2020
Legislative Date
7/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-12)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/27/2020 7/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {955767/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Symbols of Hate - Policy
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-12) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-424.4 )
Last Updated: 6/4/2021 12:15 PM
Click to return on the top page