Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Boafo, Foley, Lopez, McComas, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to immunity from criminal arrest, charge, or prosecution for a person experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0546
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0190 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2023
Legislative Date
2/01/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
House 2/01/2023 2/01/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
House 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/17/2023 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page