Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Ali, Kaiser, Turner, Adams, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, D. Barnes, Beidle, Beitzel, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Carozza, Carr, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Folden, Frush, Gaines, Glass, Gutierrez, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Krebs, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, Metzgar, A. Miller, W. Miller, Otto, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Tarlau, Walker, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for certain veterans to include certain surviving spouses of certain veterans; and providing that the Act shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {723022/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {663722/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {963929/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {105461/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Floor Amendment {723022/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Floor Amendment {663722/1 (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Floor Amendment {963929/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page