Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Lehman, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Institute for Public Leadership at the University of Maryland, College Park Campus to enhance the teaching of public leadership, provide students with opportunities for experiential learning, support students underrepresented in public service positions, build an active community of accomplished local, State, and federal practitioners, and serve as a resource for public leaders; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $1,500,000 to the Institute for each of fiscal years 2023 through 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2022
Legislative Date
1/30/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223529/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {913225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-92)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {543625/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
House 1/30/2022 1/30/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223529/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {913225/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-92) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Floor Amendment {543625/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-34) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/21/2022 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Text - Chapter - University of Maryland - Institute for Public Leadership - Establishment
(   13-105 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page