Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Cullison, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Hill, Metzgar, McDonough, Angel, and Morales
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to conduct a study regarding the location of automated external defibrillators, the costs associated with owning, using, and training individuals to use automated external defibrillators, and potential liability issues; requiring the study to include any relevant data available for calendar years 2015, 2016, and 2017; requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to report its findings to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0427
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1194 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416786/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (The Joe Sheya Act)
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {416786/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text - Chapter - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page