Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Long, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified sales and use tax exemption to include the first $40 of the taxable price of any backpack or bookbag during a designated sales tax-free period for back-to-school shopping, subject to specified limitations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {865865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Walker and Reilly)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Walker and Reilly)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Eckardt, McFadden and Currie)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Eckardt, McFadden and Currie)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {113422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {113422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {865865/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {839636/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Walker and Reilly) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Ebersole, Walker and Reilly) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Eckardt, McFadden and Currie) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Refuses Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Eckardt, McFadden and Currie) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {113422/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {113422/1 Adopted 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text - Chapter - Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
(   11-228 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page