Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, J. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Head Start Program in the State to be referred to as the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program; and requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of at least $3,000,000 for the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program in each annual budget submission.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0373
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Head Start Program - Annual Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434369/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {103722/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Head Start Program - Annual Appropriation
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {434369/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Jones) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {103722/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text - Chapter - Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)
(   5-219 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page