Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Lisanti, Krebs, and Mautz
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the limit on the number of farmers' markets at which the license holder may use a distillery off-site permit; and increasing from 6 to 32 the number of certain other events at which a distillery off-site permit may be used.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0023 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693796/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {693796/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other Events
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page