Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tree Expert Licenses - Application and Renewal Fee Alterations and Insurance Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a licensed tree expert, or a business that employs a licensed tree expert to carry and show proof of certain workers' compensation insurance for certain employees; repealing certain provisions of law establishing that certain application and renewal fees may not exceed certain amounts; and authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to permanently revoke or temporarily suspend a tree expert license if the license holder fails to maintain workers' compensation insurance in a certain manner.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0683
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tree Expert Licenses - Workers' Compensation Insurance Requirements and Application and Renewal Fee Alterations
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183023/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tree Expert Licenses - Application and Renewal Fee Alterations and Insurance Requirements
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (114-25) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/1/2024 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page