Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Biodiesel or Biofuel Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell and Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that the State ensure that at least 50% of the vehicles in the State vehicle fleet using diesel fuel use a blend of fuel containing at least 5% biodiesel or other biofuel; requiring that 100% of the vehicles in the State vehicle fleet, in specified years, use a blend of fuel containing at least a specified percentage of biodiesel or other biofuel; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page