Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Conaway, Hettleman, and Moon
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies for the purpose of reviewing the current and planned use of surveillance technology by law enforcement agencies in the State, including certain matters; requiring State agencies represented to staff the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 5, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1065 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page