Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, S. Johnson, Forbes, Harris, A. Johnson, D. Jones, J. Lewis, Ruff, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of public libraries to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining; requiring employers and certified exclusive representatives to engage in good faith bargaining; establishing a collective bargaining process for employees of public libraries; prohibiting employers and employee organizations from engaging in certain actions regarding the exercise of an employee's rights under the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Tomlinson) Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {103425/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (39-101)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-33)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733423/1
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {693920/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Tomlinson) Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {103425/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (39-101) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-33) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {733423/1 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {733423/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-35) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining (Library Workers Empowerment Act)
(   23-601 through 23-614,   23-901 through 23-913 )
Last Updated: 4/19/2024 10:46 AM
Click to return on the top page