Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Baker, Grossman, Valentine, Wivell, Arikan, Cardin, Conaway, Embry, Grammer, Kaufman, Munoz, Pasteur, Phillips, Roberson, Sample-Hughes, Schmidt, Simmons, Simpson, Taylor, and Tomlinson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain protected individual or the Office of Information Privacy in the Administrative Office of the Courts to request that a governmental entity or person not publish personal information of the individual on the Internet, social media, or social networks or remove the information from any existing publication; specifying certain procedures for the protection of personal information of a protected individual; authorizing certain relief for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, October 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {653726/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-2301 through 3-2304, 3-2401 through 3-2407 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page