Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, P. Young, Barkley, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Buckel, Carey, Chang, Ciliberti, Cullison, Folden, Frush, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jalisi, Jones, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McKay, Miele, W. Miller, Patterson, Pendergrass, Saab, Sophocleus, Turner, Wilson, Kaiser, Afzali, Rose, Wilkins, Ali, Simonaire, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Hixson, Tarlau, and Long
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each community college to ensure all student advisors are trained on the unique needs and resources available for students who are veterans, to employ at least one employee who, as a component of the employee's job duties and responsibilities, provides certain enrollment and advising services to current and prospective students who are veterans, and to establish a veterans resource center on the community college campus.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415169/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {583327/1 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {415169/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Floor Amendment {583327/1 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text - Chapter - Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act
(   16-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page