Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person in Allegany County from operating an all-terrain vehicle or snowmobile on controlled access highways; authorizing a local authority in Allegany County to authorize a person to cross a highway at a right angle on an all-terrain vehicle or snowmobile when operated at not more than 25 miles per hour; authorizing a local authority in Allegany County to authorize the operation of a snowmobile or an all-terrain vehicle on a certain portion of highway when operated at not more than 25 miles per hour; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0644
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
(   21-104.1, 25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page