Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for the purpose of collective bargaining, that employees of the Enoch Pratt Free Library be considered persons holding a position in the service of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and specifying that the employees are not special appointees.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:04 AM
Click to return on the top page