Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Bartlett, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Hornberger, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Rogers, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, Thiam, Watson, Williams, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to establish certain investment programs for enhancing certain rail lines and services operated by the Maryland Area Regional Commuter rail service; requiring the Administration to advance certain rail projects in fiscal year 2023; requiring the Administration to conduct a MARC Cornerstone Plan Implementation Study; and establishing the Transportation Trust Fund Workgroup to study certain matters and make its recommendations by December 16, 2022.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-18)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (103-30)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Overridden (30-13)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {383421/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (113-18) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (103-30) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Overridden (30-13) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Investment Program - MARC Rail Service (Maryland Regional Rail Transformation Act)
Last Updated: 6/2/2022 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page