Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Arikan, Barron, Bromwell, Cardin, Guyton, Hettleman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, and McComas
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that persons who are required to provide notice of suspected child abuse or neglect of a child or make a written report of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to provide the required notice or make the written report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor; providing certain penalties; and applying the Act only to a failure to report child abuse or neglect that occurs during the time the child is a minor.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {782517/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {858274/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, W. Fisher and Grammer) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Recede 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
(   3-602.2 )
(   5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page