Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Operating Budget - Funding - Scholarships for Nonpublic School Students
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Baker, Bouchat, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Fisher, Grammer, Griffith, Hartman, Hinebaugh, Hornberger, Howard, Hutchinson, Jacobs, Kipke, R. Long, Mangione, McComas, Metzgar, Miller, T. Morgan, Munoz, Nawrocki, Otto, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Schmidt, Stonko, Szeliga, Tomlinson, Valentine, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2026, to include in the annual budget bill General Fund appropriations of certain amounts for the Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Program.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0552
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0415 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Operating Budget - Funding - Scholarships for Nonpublic School Students
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:09 PM
Click to return on the top page