Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Employees of Targeted Businesses
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of St. Mary's County to allow, by law, certain individuals employed by certain business entities targeted for expansion in the county to claim a tax credit in an amount up to $1,000 against the county income tax; prohibiting an individual from claiming the tax credit for more than 7 consecutive taxable years; requiring the county to notify the Comptroller by a certain date if the tax credit is authorized; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - St. Mary's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Employees of Targeted Businesses
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-706, 10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page