Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Arikan, Jalisi, Long, Mangione, Metzgar, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore County Board of Education to retain counsel for legal matters affecting the County Board; requiring the County Board to employ legal counsel and a Chief Budget Analyst; providing for the terms of employment and duties of the legal counsel and Chief Budget Analyst; and prohibiting the County Board from submitting its budget to the Baltimore County Council until it has been approved by the Chief Budget Analyst.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1197 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/24/2022 6:37 PM
Click to return on the top page