Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grant Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegates V. Turner and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that 10% of the local impact grants provided to Prince George's County from proceeds of video lottery terminals is to be distributed to the Town of Forest Heights and that 2% of the grants is to be distributed to the Town of Morningside, as enacted by Chapter 1 of the Acts of the 2012 Second Special Session.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page