Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Hill, Kittleman, Lam, McComas, Metzgar, Rose, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Public School Indoor Air Quality Inspection, Evaluation, and Notification Program in the State Department of Education; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Board of Public Works and the Department of General Services, to establish the Program to enhance indoor air quality in public schools; requiring the Department to establish best practices for managing indoor air quality in public schools and provide a specified manual to local superintendents of education on or before July 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Public School Indoor Air Quality
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   7-440 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page