Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Lopez, Malone, Parrott, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before September 30, 2020, the Office of the Attorney General to post on its website an advisory protocol and voluntary training program for health care providers regarding how to respond to compulsory process requests for medical records; requiring and authorizing the Office to consult certain entities in developing the advisory protocol and voluntary training program; requiring the Office to track the traffic on its website beginning on September 30, 2020, to the extent practicable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {276384/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Records - Compulsory Process Requests - Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {276384/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page